Professional expirience
- member of the "Annals of Philosophy" Editorial Committee – secretary (8 February, 2012 - 15 February, 2017) [see www.kul.pl/ap]
- member of the University Commission on Quality of Education (21 September, 2012 - 30 September, 2013)
- member of the Faculty Commission on Quality of Education – secretary (12 September, 2012 - 30 September, 2014)
- plenipotentary of the Faculty of Philosophy Dean (September, 2012 - 30 September, 2014, established for the quality of education; February, 2013 - 30 September, 2014, established for the ECTS) [see quality of education at the Faculty of Philosophy- in Polish]
-
staff training grant (LLP-Erasmus), University of Malta – 23-29 April, 2012